House
|
05/11/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/11/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Emergency passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 10
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 71 Nays: 12
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Hardin (David)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 8; Ayes: 58 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 10
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Hardin (David)
|
|
|