Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2983 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 30, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2022
Bill March 8, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 16, 2022