Senate | 04/12/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Boles | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 15 | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Authored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kerbs | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative West (Rick) |