Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2991 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 22, 2022

Amended

Bill April 13, 2022
Bill March 2, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 1, 2022