House
|
05/09/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/09/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 11
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 20
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Worthen
|
|
|