Senate | 04/07/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Emergency added | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Referred to Public Safety | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Sims |