Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3055 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2022

Amended

Bill April 11, 2022
Bill March 2, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 1, 2022