House
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Kirt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Conference granted, SCs named Paxton, Jech, Bullard, Coleman, Allen, Boren, Kirt
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Elections and Ethics
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 5
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Elections and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Referred to Elections and Ethics
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Sims
|
|
|