LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Oklahoma OK
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB3056
Draft Versions
OK
Oklahoma House Bill HB3056
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session
Oklahoma House Bill HB3056
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 18, 2022
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
April 28, 2022
Compare
Bill
March 9, 2022
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 20, 2022
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
May 12, 2022
Compare
Bill
March 2, 2022
Compare
Amended
Bill
March 31, 2022
Compare
Bill
March 7, 2022
Compare