House
|
05/16/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/16/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 26; Ayes: 56 Nays: 19
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Young
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Matthews
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Goodwin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Dugger
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman, Stinson
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Randleman, Bush, Miller, Echols
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Talley
|
|
|