Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3073 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2022
Bill March 14, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2022

Amended

Bill April 12, 2022
Bill March 6, 2022