House
|
05/20/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative West (Josh)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Leewright
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Remove as author Senator Leewright; authored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle, Roe
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Technology Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Technology
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Phillips
|
|
|