House
|
05/16/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/16/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 15
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Technology Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Technology
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Phillips
|
|
|