Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3171 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2022
Bill March 21, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 12, 2022

Amended

Bill April 5, 2022
Bill February 18, 2022