Senate | 04/07/2022 | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 4 | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Johns, Hill, Martinez | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Miller |