Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3317 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 10, 2022

Amended

Bill April 11, 2022
Bill February 21, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 17, 2022