Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Rosecrants
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Waldron
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Ranson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 12
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Lowe (Dick), Moore, McBride, Baker, Boatman
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative West (Tammy)
|
|
|