Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3374 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 22, 2022

Amended

Bill April 12, 2022
Bill March 2, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill April 5, 2022