House
|
05/20/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Goodwin, Conley, McEntire, Culver, Lawson, Lowe (Dick), Patzkowsky, Bashore, Sneed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Hasenbeck
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Stark
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Brewer
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Pittman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative CrosswhiteHader
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Bell
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Nollan
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Townley
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Dills
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Dossett (J.A.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Virgin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator David
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Roe
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Kidd
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Kirt
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Baker, Fugate, Munson, Blancett, West (Tammy)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Taylor, Garvin, Pederson
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Bush, Miller, Ranson, Waldron, Manger, Luttrell
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Provenzano
|
|
|