Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3504 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2022
Bill March 9, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill March 4, 2022