House
|
05/09/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/09/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Kidd
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey, Roberts (Dustin), Grego, Bashore, Davis, Talley, West (Josh), McDugle, Roberts (Sean)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Kevin), Burns
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Hardin (David)
|
|
|