House
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Conference granted, GCCA
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 19; Ayes: 63 Nays: 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Authored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fetgatter
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative McBride
|
|
|