Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3568 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill March 23, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill March 2, 2022