Senate | 04/14/2022 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 04/14/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Amended | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley, McDugle | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Authored by Senator Rogers (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Fetgatter |