Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3634 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 28, 2022

Amended

Bill April 18, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 3, 2022