House
|
05/20/2022
|
Vetoed 05/20/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 23
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Withdrawn from County and Municipal Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Remove Representative Culver as principal House author and substitute with Representative Wallace
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Culver
|
|
|