Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3692 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2022
Bill March 21, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill March 4, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2022
Bill March 3, 2022