House
|
05/02/2022
|
Approved by Governor 04/29/2022
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Remove as author Senator Jech; authored by Senator Rosino
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Authored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Newton
|
|
|