Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3823 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2022

Amended

Bill April 5, 2022
Bill February 18, 2022