House
|
05/09/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/09/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Authored by Senator Floyd (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Referred to Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Remove Representative Kannady as principal House author and substitute with Representative Walke
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Kannady
|
|
|