Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3957 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2022
Bill March 23, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 5, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill March 2, 2022