Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3971 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2022
Bill March 3, 2022

Amended

Bill April 18, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022