Senate | 04/11/2022 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 55 Nays: 32; Ayes: 55 Nays: 32 | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Amended | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Emergency added | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Marti |