Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB4052 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2022

Amended

Bill April 12, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2022