House
|
05/03/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/03/2022
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative May
|
|
|