Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB4143 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 28, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 28, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill March 4, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 3, 2022