Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 15
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Conference granted, SCs named Paxton, Leewright, Taylor, Rosino, Dossett (J.J.)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 9
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Returned to General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 76 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 60
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Davis
|
|
|