Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB4287 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill March 28, 2022

Amended

Bill April 18, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2022
Bill March 3, 2022