Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 21 | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Amended | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle, Burns | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Hardin (Tommy) |