House | 04/07/2022 | CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 7 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 8 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Emergency added | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Pae (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Kirt |