Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB103 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 28, 2022

Amended

Bill April 7, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 16, 2022