Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 12
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 37 Nays: 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Considered
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Remains on Fourth Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Considered and deferred
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 41 Nays: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Leewright
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Measure failed: Ayes: 20 Nays: 24
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
SCs named Leewright, Coleman, Paxton, McCortney, Pugh, Brooks
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 17; Ayes: 63 Nays: 17
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Fetgatter (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Leewright
|
|
|