Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1147 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 29, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2022

Amended

Bill April 13, 2022
Bill February 9, 2022