Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB118 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 15, 2021

Amended

Bill April 6, 2021
Bill February 22, 2021