Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/21/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Floyd
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Kirt
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Coauthored by Ranson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Coauthored by Bush
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
remove as principal author Representative Bush and substitute with Representative Hasenbeck
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
remove as coauthor Representative(s) Hasenbeck
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Hasenbeck
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Dossett (J.A.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator David
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Stanley
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Hicks
|
|
|