Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB121 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 10, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 15, 2021

Amended

Bill April 7, 2021
Bill February 10, 2021