House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Standridge |