Senate | 04/19/2021 | Approved by Governor 04/19/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Insurance | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/23/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Sims (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Montgomery |