Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB122 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 10, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 13, 2021

Amended

Bill April 1, 2021
Bill February 9, 2021