Senate | 04/29/2022 | Approved by Governor 04/29/2022 | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Mize (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Garvin | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Remove as author Senator Garvin; authored by Senator Pugh | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Garvin |